Day(s)
As of: 4/24/2024 2:05:56 AM
Created: 3/10/2021 3:28 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Work Session
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Cybersecurity Workgroup meeting
Created: 2/12/2021 2:20 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Patterson, et al
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sen Patterson
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
(Removed - 3/9/2021 9:00 AM)
Created: 3/11/2021 10:59 AM
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Qualifications
Sen Elfreth, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/11/2021 12:00 PM)
Harford County Senators
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
Sen Klausmeier
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
The Pres (Admin)
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
Sens Carozza and Kagan
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
(Added - 3/11/2021 11:43 AM)
Sen Young
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Sens Carozza and Eckardt
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Food Sales Requirement for Class B (Golf Course) License
Sen Young
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption
Charles County Senators
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sen Hershey
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sen Eckardt
Oversight Committee on Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Membership and Cochairs
Sen Lam
Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
Sens Hester and Smith
Health - Maryland Community Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
Sen Hayes
State Anatomy Board - Claimed Cremated Remains - Provision Without Payment of Costs
(Added - 2/16/2021 11:30 AM)
Created: 3/9/2021 10:23 AM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sens Hester and Hayes
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 7:13 AM)
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
Sen Beidle, et al
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
Sen Young
Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit
(Added - 3/10/2021 1:56 PM)
Sen Zucker
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
(Added - 3/11/2021 7:13 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/11/2021 9:43 AM)
(Added - 3/10/2021 9:07 AM)
Created: 3/8/2021 4:48 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/8/2021 7:58 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/9/2021 4:01 PM
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/5/2021 5:34 PM
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Decisions
Created: 3/10/2021 1:36 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Created: 3/5/2021 5:36 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Created: 3/5/2021 5:38 PM
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
2:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Created: 3/5/2021 5:39 PM
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
4:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions- Paygo
Created: 3/11/2021 11:52 AM
2:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Wicomico County Delegation
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Food Sales Requirement for Class B (Golf Course) License
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-20
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Created: 3/9/2021 3:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/4/2021 10:04 AM
3:00 PM to 4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/24/2021 4:34 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del R. Lewis
Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
(Added - 2/25/2021 11:08 AM)
Del Barve
Real Property - Impermissible Restrictions on Use - Portable Basketball Apparatuses
Del Ruth
Equity in Transportation Sector – Guidelines and Analyses (Transportation Equity Analyses and Assurances Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/25/2021 11:08 AM)
Created: 2/16/2021 1:57 PM
Tuesday, March 9, 2021
12:30 PM to 1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
12:30 PM to 1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/11/2021 10:23 AM
5:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/11/2021 3:20 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
(Added - 2/16/2021 11:07 AM)
Del Belcastro
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations
(Added - 3/1/2021 1:55 PM)
(Added - 2/12/2021 9:48 AM)
(Added - 2/12/2021 9:48 AM)
(Added - 2/12/2021 9:48 AM)
Del Reznik
Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
Del Howard
Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment
Created: 3/9/2021 2:43 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 565
Created: 3/8/2021 9:31 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 288, 604, 652, 970, 1022, 1033, 1040 and 1287
(Added - 3/8/2021 3:54 PM)
- HB 1022
(Removed - 3/8/2021 1:53 PM)
- HB 652, 970, 1022, 1033, and 1287
(Removed - 3/8/2021 3:05 PM)
- HB 652, 970, 1022, 1033, 1040 and 1287
(Removed - 3/8/2021 3:54 PM)
Del Valentino-Smith
Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
Del Hill
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
(Removed - 3/11/2021 1:34 PM)
Created: 3/10/2021 11:36 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- HBs: 16, 234
Del Beitzel
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation – Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
(Added - 3/1/2021 2:38 PM)
Del Mangione
Economic Development - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Alterations
Chr W&M (Dept)
Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
(Added - 2/23/2021 10:37 AM)
Del Lisanti
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Election Security and High-Speed Internet Access
(Removed - 2/10/2021 8:52 AM)
Del Beitzel
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation – Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Wicomico County Delegation
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
Del Wilkins
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account
Del Washington
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Prohibition on Retaliation for Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work
Weekly Harford County House Delegation Meeting
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Maryland Rural Caucus
Created: 1/26/2021 9:55 AM
9:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
To watch click Livestream and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.