Day(s)
As of: 5/22/2025 1:07:01 AM
Created: 3/10/2021 1:54 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
SB 965 Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Created: 3/10/2021 11:00 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 3/10/2021 3:32 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that portions of the meeting may be closed in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
Insurance Administration, Maryland
Kathleen A. Birrane, Esq., Baltimore County, District 11
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays, Critical Area Commission for the
Andrew Bradshaw, Dorchester County, District 37
Civil Rights, Commission on
Magdalena Navarro, Montgomery County, District 16
Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland
Sadiya Muqueeth, Dr. P.H., Baltimore County, District 8
Elections, State Board of
Severn E.S. Miller, Esq., Baltimore County, District 42
T. Sky Woodward, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 32
Environmental Service, Maryland
Charles C. Glass, Ph.D., Montgomery County, District 18
Shelley L. Heller, Kent County, District 36
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Board of Directors
Catherine A. Bledsoe, Esq., Howard County, District 9
Phyllis G. Scalettar, Ph.D., Howard County, District 9
People's Counsel
David S. Lapp, Montgomery County, District 18
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board
Dionne N. Curbeam, Ed.D., Baltimore City, District 45
Maleeta Kitchen, Howard County, District 12
Monica A. Roebuck, Prince George's County, District 23
Sandra L. Skordalos, Baltimore County, District 6
Winona M. Taylor, Ed.D., Baltimore City, District 45
Psychologists, State Board of
Shelley M. McDermott, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 46
Kimberly A. Sanschagrin, Ph.D., Harford County, District 7
Brenda L. Terry-Leonard, Ph.D., Harford County, District 22
Public Defender, Board of Trustees of the Office of the
Mandeep S. Chhabra, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 33
Karen L. Jones, Esq., Harford County, District 7
Public Service Commission
Anthony J. O'Donnell, Calvert County, District 29
Baltimore City Community College, Board of Trustees for
Oluwafemi S. Toriola, Baltimore County, District 10
Created: 3/10/2021 3:33 PM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Apprenticeship and Training Council
Shaunta J. Chapple, Baltimore County, District 10
Archaeology, Advisory Committee on
Joseph C. Hoyt, Out-of-State (DC)
Arts Council, Maryland State
Lily Bengfort, Queen Anne's County, District 36
John Schratwieser, Kent County, District 36
Christopher P. Sloan, Allegany County, District 1
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
Stuart C. Czapski, Allegany County, District 1
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays, Critical Area Commission for the
Michael F. McCarthy, Talbot County, District 37
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program Board
Sudani Knowles, Prince George's County, District 21
Clean Energy Center, Board of Directors for the Maryland
R. Michael Gill, Baltimore County, District 42
Samuel I. Williams, Prince George's County, District 23
Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland
Scott T. Gibson, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Health Benefit Exchange Board, Maryland
K. Singh Taneja, Montgomery County, District 15
Dana Weckesser, Baltimore City, District 43
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Board of Directors
Allison N. Banks, Baltimore City, District 43
Debra A. Thomas, Esq., Baltimore City, District 43
Parole Commission, Maryland
John Dale Smack, III, Worcester County, District 38
Potomac River Fisheries Commission
William L. Rice, Sr., Charles County, District 28
Public Defender, Board of Trustees of the Office of the
Kevin B. Collins, Esq., Montgomery County, District 18
Philip T. Cronan, Esq., Dorchester County, District 37
Tonya Kelly Cronin, Esq., Baltimore County, District 42
Victoria J. Lobley, Esq., Washington County, District 2
Andrew Radding, Esq., Baltimore County, District 11
Steven W. Rakow, Esq., Worcester County, District 38
Residential Child Care Program Professionals, State Board for Certification of
Krystal Holland, Prince George's County, District 24
Lauren Wahl, Frederick County, District 3
Created: 3/11/2021 11:11 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Witness sign up for this bill will be open from March 11 at 12:30 pm until March 12 at 5:00 pm. Oral testimony on this bill will be limited to 2 minutes. Please see the Ways and Means Committee page for additional Witness Guidelines.
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Created: 3/12/2021 2:21 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/15/2021 11:44 AM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Coal– and Gas–Fired Generating Stations – Prohibitions (Prince George’s County Stop Environmentally Unjust Coal and Gas Plants Act of 2021) PG 410–21
Del Lierman
Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)
Chr ECM (Dept)
Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
Del D.E. Davis
Natural Gas – Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement – Surcharge and Plans
Del Stewart
Labor and Employment – Reinstatement of Employment – Employees at Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport (BWI–Thurgood Marshall Workers’ Right to Reinstatement Act)
Del Brooks
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices
Del Lisanti
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol by Volume - Wine
Created: 3/12/2021 2:09 PM
Monday, March 22, 2021
10:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/11/2021 4:27 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/12/2021 2:12 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/10/2021 4:31 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 288, 652, 1033, 1040, and 1287
(Added - 3/12/2021 4:27 PM)
- Bills TBD
(Removed - 3/12/2021 4:27 PM)
Created: 3/12/2021 9:24 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 565
Created: 2/24/2021 5:17 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*All bills listed below are SPONSOR ONLY* / Bills are ordered as they are listed below. Each sponsor will receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
HBs: 89, 306, 372
Created: 3/4/2021 4:11 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills will be heard in the order below
Del Malone
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Del M. Fisher
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
(Removed - 3/15/2021 8:59 AM)
Created: 3/11/2021 11:11 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Witness sign up for this bill will be open from March 11 at 12:30 pm until March 12 at 5:00 pm. Oral testimony on this bill will be limited to 2 minutes. Please see the Ways and Means Committee page for additional Witness Guidelines.
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Created: 3/12/2021 1:30 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.
Commission Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools