Day(s)
As of: 9/20/2024 11:15:31 PM
Created: 3/15/2021 11:50 AM
8:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
Sens McCray and Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 6:09 PM)
Created: 3/15/2021 11:50 AM
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/15/2021 1:48 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittees Report Budget Decisions to Full Committee
Created: 3/15/2021 1:48 PM
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/19/2021 1:37 PM
5:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
4:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 3/19/2021 3:22 PM)
Sen Hettleman
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
(Added - 3/19/2021 2:31 PM)
Sen Augustine
Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
(Added - 3/19/2021 3:19 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Finance)
Sen Jennings
Controlled Hazardous Substance Facility Permit - Research Facilities - Chemical Warfare Material Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 3/18/2021 3:54 PM
9:00 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
9:15 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Beidle, et al
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
(Added - 3/19/2021 6:59 AM)
(Added - 3/19/2021 6:59 AM)
(Added - 3/19/2021 7:59 AM)
Created: 3/18/2021 5:58 PM
9:30 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
10:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/19/2021 11:07 AM
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/18/2021 9:14 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/19/2021 2:55 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distance Restrictions PG 304-21
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Allegany County Delegation
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Transfer and Auction of Licenses
Del Charkoudian
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Washington County Delegation
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Del Fraser-Hidalgo
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Created: 3/17/2021 8:17 PM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Innovative Recreation Youth Program MC/PG 104-21
Created: 3/18/2021 3:40 PM
3:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/18/2021 3:13 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/17/2021 3:36 PM
9:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/18/2021 3:30 PM
4:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/18/2021 4:42 PM
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
3:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/1/2021 2:55 PM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del Kelly
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
The bill hearing for HB 1375 will be sponsor-only.
(Added - 3/17/2021 9:13 AM)
The bill hearing for HB 1344 will be sponsor only.
The bill hearing for HB 1349 will be sponsor only.
Del Cox
Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act)
Del Wivell
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
(Removed - 3/19/2021 12:20 PM)
Created: 3/19/2021 2:52 PM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Or 15 minutes after the conclusion of the Insurance Pharmaceuticals subcommittee meeting.
Dels Shetty and R. Lewis
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Del Charles
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Health and Government Operations)
Created: 3/18/2021 7:12 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
8:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 527 and 1214
(Added - 3/18/2021 7:33 PM)
-HB1214
(Removed - 3/18/2021 7:23 PM)
-HB 1214
(Removed - 3/18/2021 7:33 PM)
Created: 3/18/2021 7:23 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 601
Created: 3/19/2021 12:20 PM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Or 15 minutes after the conclusion of the floor session.
- HB 601
Created: 3/18/2021 7:17 PM
11:30 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 872
(Added - 3/19/2021 9:31 AM)
- HB 108 and 872
(Removed - 3/19/2021 9:31 AM)
Del Luedtke
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Dels Rosenberg and Cardin
Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
(Added - 3/18/2021 11:25 PM)
Del Hartman
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
(Added - 3/18/2021 11:25 PM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 11:25 PM)
Created: 3/19/2021 1:19 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This vote session will begin ONE HOUR after the conclusion of floor session*
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Del Hartman
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Del Luedtke
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Del Queen
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
(Added - 3/19/2021 9:12 AM)
(Added - 3/19/2021 8:54 AM)
Del Smith
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
(Removed - 3/19/2021 8:54 AM)
Created: 3/19/2021 2:03 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
This Voting Session will begin 30 minutes following today's Election Law Subcommittee Voting Session.
Del Smith
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Del Queen
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
(Added - 3/19/2021 8:41 AM)
(Added - 3/19/2021 8:41 AM)
(Removed - 3/19/2021 8:41 AM)
Created: 3/18/2021 5:20 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Election Law Subcommittee will meet directly after the Floor Session.
County Delegation Meeting - Several Invited Guests
Special Guest: Baltimore City State's Attorney, Marilyn Mosby
Voting Session
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.
Delegation Meeting