Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a definition of "location information" to include historical information concerning the geographic location of an electronic device that is or was generated by or derived from the operation of that device; and providing that certain evidence is not admissible in a criminal, civil, administrative, or any other proceeding.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0998 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page