Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Extension of MARC Service - Plans and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Acevero, Attar, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Haynes, Jalisi, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Malone, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Rosenberg, Smith, Stewart, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to develop a certain plan extending Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) service, to make certain recommendations, and to revise a certain plan; and requiring the Administration to report its recommendations and plans to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Extension of MARC Service - Plans and Report
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page