Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Bailey, Eckardt, Gallion, Ready, Salling, and West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a defendant in a malpractice claim against a licensed professional to move for a protective order to limit the disclosure of certain documentary evidence to protect the defendant from annoyance, embarrassment, oppression, or undue burden or expense; requiring a court, on a certain motion by the defendant, to review the claimant's request for documentary evidence and authorizing the court to issue a certain protective order for good cause shown; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0848 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judiciary 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Text - Chapter - Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page