Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 140

File Code: Operating Budget Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 150
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration)
Entitled:
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2011)

Synopsis:

Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/20
First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Currie) Adopted
3/23
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order evening session (Senator Currie)
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment (#1-6) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#8-14) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#16-24) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#15) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#25-36) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#37-48) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#51-57) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#49-50) Adopted (38-9)
Committee Amendment (#58-61) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#64-72) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#62-63)
Committee Amendment (#73-81) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#83-99) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#82) Adopted (33-14)
Committee Amendment (#100-109) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#110-118) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#119)
Committee Amendment (#120, 130) Adopted (35-12)
Committee Amendment (#121-122) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#123-124) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#125-128) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#129)
Committee Amendment (#131-132) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#133-153) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#154-160) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#161-185) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#62, 63) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#119, 129) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) Adopted (#186)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (15-32)
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Rejected (12-35)
Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Rejected (19-27)
Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Rejected (19-28)
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Rejected (20-26)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Adopted (#187)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Adopted (#188)
Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) Rejected (19-28)
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) Adopted (#189)
Special Order later today (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/24
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
4/1
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Senate Requests House Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Currie, Kasemeyer, Degrange, Madaleno, Brinkley
Senate advisors:
McFadden, Jones, Edwards
4/5
Conference Committee Report Adopted (38-8)
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
4/3
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/23
First Reading Appropriations
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/26
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 4/1 (Delegate Conway) Adopted
3/27
Committee Amendment (#1-12) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#13-25)
Committee Amendment (#13-15) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#16) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#17-25) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#26-36) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#37-58)
Committee Amendment (#37) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#38-42) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#43-44) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#45)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#45) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#46-50) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#51)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#51) Adopted (78-56)
Committee Amendment (#52-58) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#59-62) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#63) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#64-68) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#69-76) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (37-95)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Serafini) Rejected (43-89)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frank)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frank) Rejected (45-87)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) Rejected (38-93)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/28
Floor Amendment (Delegate Miller) Rejected (44-91)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Rice) Rejected (66-70)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bohanan) Adopted
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-35)
3/30
House Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Conway, Clagett G, Gaines, Bohanan, Beitzel
House advisors:
James, Branch, Griffith
4/3
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (105-34)
Action after passage in Senate and House
4/10
Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6)
of the Maryland Constitution
5/4
Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 482

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Not available at this time
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 143521/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:35 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 443624/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:18 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 713823/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:37 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 723924/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:33 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 783128/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:02 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 843029/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 863529/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 8:58 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 903420/02     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 8:58 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 913426/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:25 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 973920/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 9:55 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 503224/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:12 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 503522/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:31 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 543324/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:03 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 563321/01     Offered on: April 1, 2010   at: 1:22 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 783024/01     Offered on: April 1, 2010   at: 2:44 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 853522/01     Offered on: April 1, 2010   at: 2:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 983026/01     Offered on: April 1, 2010   at: 2:17 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
Senate
Budget and Taxation
House
Appropriations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 23, 2010: Committee Amendment (#49-50) Adopted (38-9)
March 23, 2010: Committee Amendment (#82) Adopted (33-14)
March 23, 2010: Committee Amendment (#120,130) Adopted (35-12)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {863529/1 Rejected (15-32)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Jacobs) {783128/1 Rejected (12-35)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Harris) {843029/1 Rejected (19-27)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Harris) {443624/1 Rejected (19-28)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Reilly) {913426/1 Rejected (20-26)
March 23, 2010: Floor Amendment (Dyson) {713823/1 Rejected (19-28)
March 24, 2010: Third Reading Passed (39-8)
April 5, 2010: Conference Committee Report Adopted (38-8)
April 5, 2010: Third Reading Passed (37-9)
House
March 27, 2010: Committee Amendment (#51) Adopted (78-56)
March 27, 2010: Floor Amendment (Shank) Rejected (37-95)
March 27, 2010: Floor Amendment (Serafini) {853522/1 Rejected (43-89)
March 27, 2010: Floor Amendment (Frank) Rejected (45-87)
March 27, 2010: Floor Amendment (Boteler) {783024/1 Rejected (38-93)
March 28, 2010: Floor Amendment (Miller) {543324/1 Rejected (44-91)
March 28, 2010: Floor Amendment (Rice) {503224/1 Rejected (66-70)
March 28, 2010: Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-35)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (105-34)
Click to return on the top page