Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 3:25:59 AM
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:39 PM)
Sen Simonaire
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sen Hough, et al
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – School Supplies for Home Instruction and Virtual Learning Programs
Sens Elfreth and Guzzone
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sen Eckardt
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal
Sens Gallion and Peters
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Briefing on the Economy - Dan White, Moody's Analytics
(Added - 1/18/2021 12:09 PM)
Briefing on the Economy
(Removed - 1/18/2021 12:09 PM)
Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:30 p.m. to 2:00 p.m.
Sens Kagan and West
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sen Elfreth, et al
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sens Elfreth and Bailey
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sen Hettleman
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sen Pinsky
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sen West
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
(Removed - 1/5/2021 9:55 AM)
Sen Kramer
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Elfreth and Hettleman
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sen Carter
Public Information Act - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Sen Young
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sen Sydnor, et al
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Sen Sydnor
Police Officers - Testimony - Presumption of Inadmissibility (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021)
(Removed - 1/13/2021 2:18 PM)
Created: 1/14/2021 3:32 PM
5:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/12/2021 1:13 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 4:26 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment - Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
Del Stewart
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Del Lierman
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Del Carr
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Created: 1/21/2021 10:22 AM
5:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
All bill hearings on January 21 will be sponsor only. Final bill order below.
The bill hearing for HB 5 will be sponsor only.
The bill hearing for HB 38 will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/7/2021 12:42 PM)
The bill hearing for HB 182 will be sponsor only.
Del Hill, et al
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
The bill hearing for HB 236 will be sponsor only.
Del Pena-Melnyk
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Committee - Reporting and Sunset Extension
The bill hearing for HB 297 will be sponsor only.
Del Gilchrist
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
The bill hearing for HB 317 will be sponsor only.
Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Crutchfield, et al
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Del J. Lewis
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Created: 12/22/2020 10:48 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Maryland State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency
Created: 12/22/2020 1:37 PM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Malone
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses – Annual Limitation
Del Malone
Sales and Use Tax – Tax–Free Period for Back–to–School Shopping – School Supplies and Textbooks
Del Luedtke
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
Del Wilkins
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Del Wilkins
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Health and Government Operations)
The bill hearing for HB0262 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Initial Meeting of the Carroll County Delegation for the 2021 Session.
Delegation Bills and Priorities.
General Business.
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting
Discussion of Legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.