Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 4:19:19 AM
Created: 4/1/2021 5:43 PM
9:00 AM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
9:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 4/2/2021 9:29 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 4/2/2021 9:29 AM)
Del Washington
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
(Added - 4/2/2021 9:29 AM)
Del Rosenberg
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Valderrama
Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
Del D. Jones
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Del Bridges
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Del Lierman
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Howard County Delegation
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Howard County Delegation
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Del Washington
Guaranteed Access Grant and Next Generation Scholars of Maryland – Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
(Added - 4/2/2021 9:29 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 4/2/2021 9:29 AM)
Sen Lee
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sen Hayes
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 3/24/2021 11:52 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills hearings will begin at 3:15 p.m.
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02-21
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Howard County Delegation
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21
Created: 4/1/2021 3:28 PM
10:45 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 4/1/2021 3:51 PM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 7:28 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
(Added - 4/1/2021 3:51 PM)
Created: 4/2/2021 9:53 AM
10:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/2/2021 2:58 PM
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/2/2021 3:21 PM
5:15 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
6:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sponsor hearings of bills for rereferrals.
Created: 4/1/2021 8:16 PM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/2/2021 2:33 PM
2:40 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Sen Elfreth, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sen Kramer
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
Sen Hester ChrJntCybrInfTchBtchCmm, et al
Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Created: 4/1/2021 6:25 PM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/31/2021 3:05 PM
8:30 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/1/2021 6:08 PM
5:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Del Bagnall
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Del Kipke
State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Requirements for Selection of Pharmacy Benefits Manager
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Sen Augustine
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Sens Young and Waldstreicher
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Chr JPR (Dept)
Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Sen Lam (Audio, HrgAidDisp, Sp-LangPath)
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Sens Hester and Smith
Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
(Added - 4/2/2021 11:42 AM)
Created: 4/1/2021 1:11 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 108 and HB 132
Created: 4/2/2021 11:07 AM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- JUD Vote Session to consider Senate amendments on HB 670
Created: 4/2/2021 3:51 PM
3:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*House Judiciary Vote Session to consider technical amendments for SB 71 and SB 178*
Created: 4/2/2021 10:34 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Voting Session will begin 30 minutes following today’s House floor session.
(Added - 4/2/2021 2:15 PM)
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Expansion and Extension
Created: 4/1/2021 1:23 PM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Expansion and Extension
County Delegation Meeting - Several Invited Guests.
Bill Hearings - Sponsor Only
SB138, SB150
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.
Hearings on House bills
Possible Voting