Status as of May 23, 1996: Became Law - Chapter 561
Sponsored By
The President (Administration) and Senators Pica, Blount, Hoffman,
Forehand, Hughes, Kelley, Currie, Dorman, Frosh, Hollinger, Kasemeyer,
Lawlah, Madden, McFadden, Pinsky, Ruben, Teitelbaum, Trotter, Van
Hollen, and Young
Status as of January 31, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Sponsored By
The President (Administration) and Senators Bromwell, Currie, Dorman,
Hafer, Hogan, Kasemeyer, Lawlah, McFadden, Middleton, Munson, Roesser,
Ruben, and Van Hollen
Entitled
Tax Credits - Creation of New Jobs and Employment of Individuals with
Disabilities
Status as of April 9, 1996: Became Law - Chapter 4
Sponsored By
The President (Administration) and Senators Blount, Hollinger,
Collins, Lawlah, Craig, Dyson,
Frosh, McCabe, Pinsky, Sfikas, Stoltzfus, Teitelbaum, and Green
Entitled
Education - School Order and Discipline
Committee Assignments
Senate: Economic and Environmental Affairs
House: Ways and Means
Status as of April 30, 1996: Became Law - Chapter 147
Sponsored By
Senator Hollinger (Governor's Task Force on Assisted Living) and
Senators Collins, Lawlah, Teitelbaum, Green, Forehand, Dorman, Roesser,
Kelley, Hoffman, Hafer, Stone, Boozer, Middleton, and Astle
Status as of May 23, 1996: Vetoed by the Governor - Duplicative
Sponsored By
The President (Administration) and Senators
Amoss, Hoffman, Boozer, Munson, McFadden, Ruben, Currie, Van Hollen,
Hogan, Lawlah, Middleton, and Kasemeyer
Status as of April 4, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Sponsored By
Senators Ruben, Amoss, Boozer, Lawlah, McFadden, and Munson (Public
Safety, Transportation, Economic Development, and Department of Natural
Resources Subcommittee)
Entitled
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Appointments with Independent
Insurance Agents