Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Corderman, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Folden, Gallion, Gile, Griffith, Hayes, Hershey, James, Klausmeier, Lam, Mautz, McCray, McKay, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making certain telephone solicitations to a certain called party in a certain manner by restricting the methods, times, and identifying information that the person making the call may utilize; and making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice that is subject to enforcement and penalties under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0037
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983321/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {203929/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
4/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {983321/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments {983321/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Floor Amendment {203929/1 (Senator West) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Economic Matters 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2023 4/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
(   13-301,   14-4501 through 14-4504 )
Last Updated: 3/31/2023 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page