Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law to require the State Archives to compile, edit, and publish an online Maryland Manual that describes the State, its government, and federal officials and agencies directly related to the State; requiring, as provided in the State budget, the State Archives to update the Maryland Manual to maintain its accuracy and to annually preserve a version that contains changes made in the preceding year; encouraging the Archivist to reach out to specified entities regarding the availability of the Maryland Manual; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0516
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776587/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {776587/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text - Chapter - State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
(   9-1026, 9-1027 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page