Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Anderson, Busch, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jackson, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying specified weapons on public school property; prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; requiring a public institution of higher education to post specified signs in prominent locations on the property; requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to incorporate into their bylaws, policies and procedures, the current weapons practice on campus; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1002 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (52-84)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {623021/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {763320/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (53-82)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-49)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-20)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Valentino-Smith and Ciliberti)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Valentino-Smith and Ciliberti)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {384766/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (52-84) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Floor Amendment {623021/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Floor Amendment {763320/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (53-82) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (84-49) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {228373/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (27-20) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Valentino-Smith and Ciliberti) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Valentino-Smith and Ciliberti) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-102 )
(   15-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page