Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Anderson, Angel, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Frick, Glass, Hettleman, Hill, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Lierman, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, McKay, Moon, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Proctor, Rey, Reznik, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, subject to a specified exception, an individual under the age of 18 from marrying; and authorizing an individual 16 or 17 years old to marry under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0861
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0911 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-301, 2-402, 2-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page