Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Sanchez, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, P. Young, Kaiser, A. Miller, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are exempt from paying the out-of-state tuition rate at public institutions of higher education; altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a public senior higher education institution or the in-county rate at a community college; requiring certain individuals to retain a certain tuition status until the individual is awarded a certain degree under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0546
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {535867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Reassigned to Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {535867/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
(   15-106.8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page