Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carey, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, Hornberger, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1122
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {144563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {144563/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page