Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Klausmeier, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain individual who is a civilian employee of the federal government is eligible to receive unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Catastrophic Event Account to enable the State to respond to federal civilian employee financial hardship from a full or partial federal government shutdown due to a lapse in federal appropriations; establishing a certain loan fund to provide loans to civilian employees of the federal government under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-27)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Civilian Federal Employees - Benefits (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {387875/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (111-27) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Returned Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text - Chapter - Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
(   6-226, 7-324, 7-327 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page