Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0783 - Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights

Judicial Proceedings 3/9/2022 1:00:00 PM
As of: 12/3/2022 3:31:14 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Smith, Senator Smith FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Powell, Michael Gordon Feinblatt, LLC UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB783_jpr_unf.pdf
JPR
Moore, Thomas Earle 3rd Rock Research FAV SB0783_TEMoore_Fav.pdf JPR
Day, Jacob City of Salisbury FAV Mayor Day SB 783 FAV Testimony.pdf JPR
Breen, John FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 0783 EHRA Final Testimony 03092022.pdf
JPR
Kasemeyer, Pam UNF SB0783_UNF_NWRA_Constitutional Amend. - Env. Right JPR
Jarvis, Barbara FAV SB0783_RPPC_fav.pdf JPR
Simon, Robert Maryland Catholics for Our Common Home FAV SB 783_Maryland Catholics for Our Common Home_FAV. JPR
Marguerite, Christianne Progressive Maryland FAV L.Scarito SB 783 Testimony Template.docx(1).pdf
Megan SB 783 Testimony.docx.pdf
SB0783 Testimony from Todd Larsen.docx.pdf
JPR
Thompson, Lindsay UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Kuhns, Theresa Maryland Realtors UNF SB783 22 Testimony .pdf JPR
Jasen, Debi FAV No Testimony JPR
Sakata, Michael MTBMA UNF SB 783_MTBMA_UNF.pdf JPR
Clark, Rachel Evans & Associates, LLC UNF SB 783_MAA_UNF.pdf JPR
Egan, Ashley UULM-MD FAV Testimony SB 783 - Environmental Rights JPR UULM-M
Testimony SB 783 - Environmental Rights UULM-MD-UU
JPR
Redicker, Jane UNF SB783 - Constitutional Amendment - Environmental R JPR
Kraska, MJ Maryland Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_FAV_SB0783.pdf JPR
Gayle, Linda FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0783_EHRA_MLC_FAV.pdf JPR
Avins, Miriam Baltimore City Commission on Sustainability FAV Balt Sust Commn - SB783 Enviro Rights.pdf JPR
Hartwell, Staci NAACP FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
NAACP MSC - SB 783 Written Testimony for Maryland
NAACP MSC SB783 Environmental Human Rights Amendme
JPR
Littleton, Matt FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Chitalia, Suhani FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2022 ACNM SB 783 Senate Side.pdf
ANHE Testimony SB 783 Constitutional Amendment - E
David Boyd testimony 2022 hb596.pdf
Dorchester Citizens for Planned Growth Support.pdf
Episcopal testimony SB 783 Support .pdf
Kury (PA) SB 783 Support.pdf
Larry Ryan SB 783 Support .pdf
Megan Latshaw SB783 Support .pdf
SB 783 Heidi SP Support .pdf
SB 783 Testimony MD CEHC 2022 MD EHR Amendment 220
JPR
Hart, Kyle National Parks Conservation Association FAV NPCA Letter in Support of the MD Environmental Hum JPR
Chitalia, Suhani FAV Senate BLMA MD Amend Enviro Rights 3.4.2022.pdf
UMC SB 783 Support .pdf
JPR
Guitarra, Denisse Audubon Naturalist Society FAV 2022-03-08-SB783 - ANS - FAV.pdf JPR
Rose, Jodi Interfaith Partners for the Chesapeake FAV EHRA Senate Judiciary Proceedings Comm Mar 2022.pd JPR
Porter, Holly UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2022 SB 783 Environmental Rights.pdf
JPR
Gaut, Mary FAV SB 0783_mdg_fav.pdf JPR
Fox, Jamal City of Takoma Park FAV Takoma Park SB 783 Support.pdf JPR
Rosenthal, Lore FAV SB783- EHR - Judic Proc - GCAN-FAV.pdf JPR
Carella, Veronika Maryland Children's Environmental Health Coalition (MD CEHC) FAV SB 783 Testimony MD CEHC 2022 MD EHR Amendment 220 JPR
Hoefner, Ferd Takoma Park Presbyterian Church FAV SB783 MD Environ Rights_TPPC fav-1.pdf JPR
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood FAV SB0783-FAV-DTMG-3-9-22.pdf JPR
Wilkinson, nanci Cedar Lane Unitarian Universalist Church Environmental Justice Ministry FAV Environmental Human Rights Amendt.pdf JPR
Miller, Claire Maryland Campaign for Environmental Human Rights FAV SB783_MDEHR_FAV_ Dignitary Letter of Support.pdf
SB783_MDEHR_FAV_168 Organizations in Support.pdf
SB783_MDEHR_Fav_MDEHRA Petition-merged.pdf
JPR
Beller, Joel Baltimore County Government FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_SB0783.pdf JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-03-09 SB 783 (Support).pdf JPR
Goldstein, Mathew Secular Maryland FAV SB 783_mgoldstein_fav 2022.pdf JPR
Dismel, Antonio Baltimore beyond plastic FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Support SB783 BBP 2022.pdf
JPR
Graf, Lori Maryland Building Industry Association UNF MBIA Letter of Opposition SB 783.pdf JPR
Cleghorn, J. Stephen Maryland Catholics for Our Common Home FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Cleghorn MCCH Testimony SB783 WRITTEN.pdf
JPR
Lacock-Nisly, Jonathan Interfaith Power & Light (DC.MD.NoVA) FAV Testimony for IPL on SB 783 - Constitutional Amend JPR
Voytek, Maddy MD Chamber of Commerce UNF SB 783_MDCC_Constitutional Amendment-Environmental JPR
Cardin, Nina FAV SB783 AG office favorable.pdf
SB783 Cleo Braver favorable.pdf
sb783 mdehr favorable.pdf
SB783 nina beth cardin fav.pdf
SB783 Percival favorable.pdf
SB783 Rachel Hopp fav.pdf
sb783 susan olsen fav.pdf
SB783 Washington College SGA fav.pdf
JPR
Sanderson, Michael Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0783-JPR_MACo_OPP.pdf
JPR
Ziaja, Sonya FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 783_sz_fav.pdf
JPR
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV sb783, constitutional environmental right, 2022.pd JPR
Singer, Elizabeth Jewish Community Relations Council, Jewish Federation of Howard County FAV SB783_JCRC_fav.pdf JPR
Cheng, Joyce Chesapeake Physicians for Social Responsibility FAV Senate EHRA Testimony.pdf JPR
McGilvray, Laurie Takoma Park Mobilization Environment Committee FAV SB783-MDEnvironHumanRights-JPR-TPMEC-fav.pdf JPR
McGilvray, Laurie Climate Justice Wing of the Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB783-MDEnvironHumanRights-JPR-CJW-fav.pdf JPR
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony JPR
Belkov, Cynthia UNF No Testimony JPR
Norton, Ruth Ann Green & Healthy Homes Initiative FAV GHHI Written Testimony - SB783.pdf JPR
Miller, Elizabeth Green Towson Alliance FAV 20220308 SB783HB0596 LOS mdehr.pdf JPR
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony JPR
Ashley-Williams, Wandra FAV SB0783_washley-williwma_CXC_Fav.pdf JPR
Matheson, Barbara FAV SB0783 March 9,2022.pdf JPR
Love, William UNF No Testimony JPR
Tulkin, Josh MD Sierra Club FAV SB783_MDSierraClub_fav - 9Mar2022.pdf JPR
D’Orazio , Daniela UNF No Testimony JPR
Ferguson, Colby Maryland Farm Bureau UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
Opposition of SB 783 - Constitutional Amendment -
JPR
Jakuta, Joseph Climate Parents of Prince George's FAV SB0783 - EHRA - Testimony - Climate Parents of Pri JPR
Fink, Nelda UNF SB783-NaturalResourcesTrustee-Unfavorable-Fink-D32 JPR
Boyd, Linda Maryland Episcopal Public Policy Network FAV HB596 SB783 testimony 2022 EHRA jp and ehea comms. JPR
Kranz, Rhonda Takoma Park Mobilization Environment Committee FAV Testimony (SB783) MD Environmental Human Rights Am JPR
Grindrod, Jacky FAV Sierra ClubTestimony EHRA 2022.pdf JPR
Schmitt, Katlyn Center for Progressive Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Ennis, Ella UNF SB 0783 - Constitutional Amendment Environmental R JPR
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony JPR
Gansler, Douglas Former Attorney General of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Sanchez, Carlo FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
University of Maryland, College Park, SGA Director of Sustainability University of Maryland, Student Government Association FAV SSC EHRA (SB783) Testimony.pdf JPR
Bailey, Angelica Maryland Municipal League UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 783_UNF_MML.pdf
JPR
Benn, Sarahia FAV SB0783-Fav Testimony POLICY FOUNDATION OF MARYLAND JPR
Arndt, Dave FAV SB783 Favorable Testimony docx.pdf JPR
McNair, Lee Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry FAV Testimony - SB0783 - Maryland Environmental Rights JPR
Schwarz, Kurt Maryland Ornithological Society FAV MOS SB0783 Constitutional Amendment-Environmental JPR
Clark, Robin Jessica Chesapeake Bay Foundation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 783_CBF SUPPORT.pdf
JPR
Snow, Dylan FAV SB783FAV.pdf JPR
Raindrop, Bonnie Smart on Pesticides FAV SB783_FAV_SOPC.pdf JPR
Diefenbach, Klaus UNF No Testimony JPR
DuBois, Gwen Chesapeake Physicians for Social Responsibility FAV sb783gwen Human Rights amendment testimony22322.pd JPR
Isaacson, Evan Chesapeake Legal Alliance FAV SB 783 - CLA Testimony.pdf JPR
Grifo-Hahn, Luca FAV Luca Grifo-Hahn_Environmental Rights Amendment Wri JPR
mcavoy, vince UNF SB0783_UNF_opposed_vmcavoy.pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-9-2022 at 1012 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page