Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 5:29:42 AM
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/22/2021 3:53 PM
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kagan
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
Sen Edwards
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
Sen Hayes
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
(Added - 2/22/2021 6:28 PM)
Created: 2/22/2021 3:53 PM
4:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/12/2021 9:30 AM)
Capital Department of Housing and Community Development
(Removed - 1/6/2021 2:07 PM)
Capital Mayland Independent College and University Association
(Removed - 1/12/2021 9:30 AM)
Created: 2/10/2021 10:08 AM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:15 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Washington
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Sen Hayes
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Hayes
Community Development Administration - Live Near Your School Program - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Washington (Ch Jt Comm End Hmlnss)
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sen Lam (Chr Joint Audit and Eval Comm)
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sen Lee
State Procurement – Internet of Things Devices – Guidelines, Standards, and Purchasing Restrictions
(Removed - 2/18/2021 3:50 PM)
Sen Bailey
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
(Added - 1/31/2021 1:06 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Beidle, et al
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Klausmeier
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sen Klausmeier
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sen Augustine
Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
(Removed - 2/15/2021 11:49 AM)
Created: 2/4/2021 9:26 AM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/9/2021 5:11 PM)
(Added - 2/17/2021 10:56 AM)
Sen Hough, et al
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
(Removed - 2/19/2021 11:08 AM)
Created: 2/22/2021 7:22 PM
4:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 1/12/2021 9:25 AM)
Capital Department of Housing and Community Development
(Removed - 1/6/2021 2:07 PM)
Capital Mayland Independent College and University Association
(Removed - 1/12/2021 9:25 AM)
Created: 1/28/2021 10:18 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Carey
Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:13 PM)
Del Valderrama
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
(Removed - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Beitzel
Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
(Removed - 2/18/2021 1:10 PM)
Del Carey
Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
(Removed - 2/18/2021 1:15 PM)
Created: 2/7/2021 10:27 AM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Public Body MC 07–21
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Del Holmes
Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
Del Stewart
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Del Stewart
Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021)
Del Bridges
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Del Conaway
Real Property - Residential Lease Provisions - Responsibility of Tenant for Maintenance and Repair
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Del Conaway
Landlord and Tenant – Cancellation or Renewal of Lease – Notification Requirement
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Created: 2/16/2021 1:51 PM
12:30 PM to 1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/23/2021 12:40 PM
5:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:40 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/4/2021 12:54 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
The Spkr (Admin)
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/11/2021 11:06 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2021 11:06 AM)
Del Cullison
Maryland Department of Health - 2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program
Del Charles
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Bagnall
Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products
Created: 2/22/2021 10:44 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 123
Created: 2/19/2021 5:01 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 611, 643, 689
Created: 1/31/2021 9:37 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each bill sponsor will receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Shetty
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Del W. Fisher, et al
Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Ivey
Private Institutions of Higher Education - Police Departments - Repeal and Prohibition
(Added - 2/11/2021 9:26 AM)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del Hartman
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del Feldmark
Election Law – Absentee Ballot Canvassing – Multiple Ballots Cast by an Individual
Del Attar
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Activities That Promote Health and Physical Well-Being
Del Shoemaker
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
The bill hearing for HB0815 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:26 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Witness sign up for SB 218 will be open Monday, February 22 from 8:00 a.m. until 3:00 p.m. As per Ways and Means Committee Witness Guidelines, the oral testimony time limit per witness may be reduced if there are 30-50 witnesses signed up
(Added - 2/19/2021 4:58 PM)
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del Arentz
Election Law - Voter Registration List - Right to Nondisclosure of Personal Information
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del Palakovich Carr
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:10 PM)
Del Rosenberg
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
(Removed - 2/22/2021 1:40 PM)
Created: 2/19/2021 4:58 PM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee will meet at 5:30 or immediately following full committee bill hearings.”
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools