Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:02:34 PM
Created: 3/24/2021 2:22 PM
10:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Budget Subcommittee reports its budget decisions to Full Committee and committee vote on HB590
Created: 3/25/2021 2:55 PM
Thursday, March 25, 2021
2:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del K. Young
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Del Lierman
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Del Charkoudian
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Del Lierman
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Del Charles
Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
Del D. Jones
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sen Lee
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Finance)
Sen Klausmeier (Dept)
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Created: 3/26/2021 2:17 PM
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sens Hester and Rosapepe
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
Sen Klausmeier (Chr Jt Com on UIO)
Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
Sen Klausmeier (Chr Jt Com on UIO)
Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Sen Rosapepe
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sen West
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Qualifications
Harford County Senators
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sen Washington
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Sen Young
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Charles County Senators
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sen Hershey
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Chr FIN (Dept)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Sen Kelley
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Chr FIN (Dept)
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Chr FIN (Dept)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Chr JPR (Dept)
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sen Benson
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Created: 3/25/2021 2:54 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sponsor-only testimony: SB 202, 494 | Written testimony may be submitted for this bill by emailing it to dylan.goldberg@mlis.state.md.us
Created: 3/25/2021 5:23 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This vote session will begin at 2:30pm*
Del J. Lewis
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sen West, et al
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sen Kelley, et al
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
County Delegation Meeting - Several Invited Guests
Bill Hearings and Voting Session on Local Senate Bills.
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Frederick County House Delegation Meeting
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.
Created: 3/22/2021 5:21 PM
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
10:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Please Note: The meeting will take place immediatey following session.
Work Session: HB444, HB501, HB562, HB567, HB571, HB769
(Added - 3/26/2021 9:53 AM)
Work Session: HB501, HB562, HB567, HB571, HB769
(Removed - 3/24/2021 9:32 AM)
Work Session: HB444, HB501, HB562, HB567, HB571, HB769
(Removed - 3/24/2021 1:31 PM)
Work Session: HB444, HB501, HB562, HB564, HB567, HB571, HB769
(Removed - 3/26/2021 9:53 AM)