Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch, Acevero, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Bridges, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Qi, Reznik, Rosenberg, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that the people have the right to bodily integrity and privacy to make personal decisions about childbearing and procreation without unwarranted government intrusion; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page