Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 1:46:37 AM
The Pres (Admin)
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:01 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
Sen Benson
Income Tax – Credit for the Purchase and Installation of Indoor Air Quality Equipment
Sen Patterson
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
Sen West
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Created: 1/6/2021 1:48 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Eckardt
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Sen Augustine
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sens Young and Waldstreicher
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Sen Simonaire
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sen Reilly
State Board of Pharmacy – Pharmacy Closure – Notice to Customers (The Dennis Robin Act)
Sen Washington
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sen McCray
Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:32 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:32 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:32 PM)
Sens Hettleman and Feldman
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
(Removed - 1/15/2021 2:47 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Sen Lee
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Created: 1/7/2021 8:06 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Department of Health - Pharmacy Services
Maryland Department of Health - Medicaid Error Rate (Performance)
Maryland Department of Transportation - Maryland Vehicle Administration
State Department of Assesments and Taxation
Created: 1/12/2021 1:13 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
Del Krimm
Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband
Del Lierman, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Del Dumais
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:53 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:53 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:53 PM)
Created: 12/22/2020 4:28 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Rosenberg
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Del Henson
Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting
Del Holmes
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Del Holmes
Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Del Stewart
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Created: 1/25/2021 8:27 AM
5:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The exact time of the meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are completed. Please call 410-841-3990 after bill hearings for time if needed.
Canceled
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/25/2021 5:34 PM
5:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The exact time of the meeting will be announced after bill hearings are completed. Please call the committee for exact time.
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Bill Order
Dels Pena-Melnyk and R. Lewis
Public Health – Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Created: 1/15/2021 4:18 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Moon
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Del W. Fisher
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Del Malone
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
Dels Hill and Feldmark
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Created: 12/22/2020 4:44 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Del Ruth
Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
Created: 1/22/2021 2:55 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Local Alcohol Bill Hearings