Day(s)
As of: 5/2/2024 8:39:22 PM
Created: 1/27/2021 11:34 AM
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 1/5/2021 9:55 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:30 p.m. to 1:30 p.m.
Sen Reilly
Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
Sens Hester and Elfreth
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/20/2021 11:49 AM)
Sen Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Added - 1/6/2021 1:48 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Hayes
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
(Added - 1/15/2021 4:03 PM)
Sen Reilly
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sen McCray
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/25/2021 8:29 AM)
(Added - 1/25/2021 8:29 AM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:39 PM)
(Removed - 1/28/2021 10:28 AM)
Created: 1/27/2021 3:25 PM
11:00 AM
-
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/27/2021 3:28 PM
3:00 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/18/2021 2:53 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Henson
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Handwashing Facilities on Construction Sites
Del Valderrama
Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19
Created: 1/18/2021 3:48 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing
Created: 12/22/2020 4:37 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 1/11/2021 3:33 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 1/11/2021 3:33 PM)
Created: 1/21/2021 10:22 AM
5:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Time of the subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Bill Order below
Del Charles
State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Duties and Report on eMaryland Marketplace
Del W. Fisher
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Dorchester County Delegation
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Del Luedtke
Procurement - Invasive and Nonnative Plant Species - Prohibition on Use of State Funds
Created: 1/25/2021 9:56 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 135, HB 141, HB 233
Created: 1/15/2021 4:18 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Dels Bhandari and C. Jackson
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Del Mangione
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property (Predator–Free Schools Act)
(Added - 1/18/2021 6:30 PM)
Del Luedtke
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
(Removed - 1/26/2021 6:23 PM)
Allegany County Delegation
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:13 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:13 PM)
The bill hearing for HB0443 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:13 PM)
Del Lehman
Corporate Income Tax – Combined Reporting and Subtraction Modification for Combined Groups of Corporations
The bill hearing for HB0172 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
The bill hearing for HB0229 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:13 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 2:13 PM)
The Delegation will be voting on the remainder of the legislation for the 2021 Session.
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting