Day(s)
As of: 4/24/2024 10:05:46 AM
Created: 3/6/2021 1:20 PM
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:14 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
(Added - 3/12/2021 9:07 AM)
Sen Pinsky
States of Emergency – Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments – Notice and Authorization
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:14 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:14 PM)
Sen Guzzone
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations and Degree and Credential Programs - Alterations
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:14 PM)
For Discussion
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:14 PM)
Created: 3/11/2021 8:10 PM
3:30 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:45 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Pinsky
Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Griffith, et al
Procurement – Department of General Services – MBE Program Compliance Officer
Sen Kagan, et al
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board
Sen Pinsky
Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Sens Hester and Simonaire
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sen McCray
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization Programs - Application Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Jackson (Jnt Cybscty Info Biotch Cmm)
Department of Information Technology - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
Sen Lam (Chr Joint Audit and Eval Comm)
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 3/12/2021 10:37 AM)
Created: 3/8/2021 4:48 PM
10:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/15/2021 7:16 AM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Saab
Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Economic Matters)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 2/22/2021 8:26 PM)
(Added - 2/26/2021 11:16 AM)
Del Thiam
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
(Removed - 2/16/2021 4:23 PM)
Created: 3/11/2021 4:41 PM
Thursday, March 11, 2021
7:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 3/11/2021 4:43 PM)
HB581-Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers Protection Act)
Created: 3/12/2021 11:12 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Williams
State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
Del Lierman
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Del Charkoudian
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
Del Ivey
Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021)
Del Stewart
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Created: 3/11/2021 9:23 AM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Del Gilchrist
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Kipke
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Del Charles
Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Del Valentino-Smith
Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Del Cullison
Secretary of Health – School–Based Health Centers – Guidelines and Administration of Grants
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Sample-Hughes
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Created: 3/9/2021 2:43 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 565
Del Stewart
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Del Attar
Baltimore City – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Registration and License Information
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Del Crutchfield
Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
Del Clippinger
Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension
(Removed - 3/12/2021 1:49 PM)
Created: 3/10/2021 5:21 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Some or all of these bills to be voted on.
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
(Added - 3/12/2021 8:57 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
(Added - 3/11/2021 1:24 PM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
(Added - 3/12/2021 8:57 AM)
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
(Added - 3/12/2021 8:57 AM)
Del D. Jones
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
(Added - 3/11/2021 5:03 PM)
Wicomico County Delegation
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Del Washington
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Prohibition on Retaliation for Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work
Del Wilkins
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account
(Removed - 3/11/2021 1:13 PM)
(Removed - 3/11/2021 4:09 PM)
(Removed - 3/12/2021 11:39 AM)
Del Beitzel
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation – Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
(Removed - 3/12/2021 11:39 AM)
(Removed - 3/12/2021 1:59 PM)
Created: 3/10/2021 2:43 PM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
NOTE: This will be a discussion session only.
Del Ebersole
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Requirements, Reporting, and Training
Del Smith
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
Del D. Jones
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Del Washington
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Prohibition on Retaliation for Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work
County Delegation Meeting
Voting Session
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.
Work Session:
SB536, HB541, HB562, HB768
Southern Maryland Delegation Meeting
Rep. David Trone and tentatively MDH will be joining while the delegation provides updates on the legislative status of Western Maryland.