Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Busch, Kipke, Adams, Afzali, Ali, Anderson, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Beitzel, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Clark, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Ghrist, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McIntosh, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Mosby, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Rey, Reznik, Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vogt, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, Wilkins, Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, under certain circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely certain rights and the parent's responsibility to support the child, including payment of child support; requiring the court to refer an unrepresented parent to legal services or to appoint counsel; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0002
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/15/2017
Legislative Date
8/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2018
Legislative Date
1/08/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {852216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/15/2017 8/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
House 1/08/2018 1/08/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {852216/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Returned Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
(   5-1401 through 5-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page