Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, Ali, Angel, D. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Gaines, Gibson, Glenn, Haynes, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to establish certain guidelines by December 1, 2018, for public schools regarding the administration of health care services to students with sickle cell disease; requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health by December 1, 2018, to provide technical assistance on implementation of the guidelines and to develop a process to monitor implementation of the guidelines; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Sickle Cell Disease Management Programs
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {305765/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994935/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page