Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Anderson, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Frick, Glass, Hettleman, Hill, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Lierman, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, Moon, Morhaim, Proctor, Rey, Reznik, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions authorizing individuals under the age of majority to marry under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0911 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {133422/1 (Delegate M. Washington)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected (64-72)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-93)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-46)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {133422/1 (Delegate M. Washington) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected (64-72) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-93) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-46) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {138374/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-301, 2-402, 2-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page