Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators King, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum income limits on eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain child and dependent care expenses; altering the phase-out of the tax credit; making the credit refundable, subject to certain income limits; increasing, each taxable year, certain income eligibility and refundability thresholds by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {655767/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
(   10-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page