Day(s)
As of: 9/19/2024 10:16:55 AM
Created: 1/17/2022 4:38 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
These bills are being heard before the Pensions Subcommittee
Created: 1/17/2022 4:38 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearings
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/16/2022 2:58 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Introduction of and Remarks by State Superintendent of Schools Mohammed Choudhury.
Created: 1/16/2022 2:38 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Cybersecurity Briefing with the Maryland Cybersecurity Council.
Created: 1/26/2022 2:49 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
Chr EHE (Dept)
Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 2:52 PM)
Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data
Sen Patterson
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Education Requirements (Give Me A Chance - Job Opportunities Act of 2022)
Sen Kramer
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
(Removed - 1/15/2022 1:14 PM)
Created: 1/21/2022 12:42 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/26/2022 10:48 AM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
(Added - 1/26/2022 10:48 AM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
(Added - 1/26/2022 10:48 AM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 10:48 AM)
(Added - 1/26/2022 10:48 AM)
Created: 1/10/2022 2:55 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/10/2022 2:55 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/3/2022 1:41 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
In the event this hearing has not completed by 2pm, it will continue at 4pm as a Briefing
Created: 1/27/2022 1:57 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Continuation of Higher Education Overview
Created: 1/13/2022 4:07 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 1/24/2022 4:47 PM)
Created: 1/10/2022 11:40 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/26/2022 9:29 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/24/2022 10:08 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Canceled
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Maryland Department of Health’s Behavioral Health Administrative Service Organization (Optum) Issues
Created: 1/12/2022 9:01 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
This hearing as been postponed until 4:00pm to accommodate today's session
Created: 1/21/2022 12:22 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HBs 21 and 155
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Created: 1/17/2022 9:47 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
PLEASE NOTE: Due to a House Floor Session from 2:00 to 4:00, the hearing will start at 1:00 PM, break for the Floor Session, and resume at approximately 4:00 PM.
PLEASE NOTE: Testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Amprey
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Del Thiam
Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
Del Palakovich Carr
Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines and Requirements
Del Luedtke
State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
Dels Charkoudian and Solomon
Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Created: 1/25/2022 6:44 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
PLEASE NOTE: Voting Session will take place 15 minutes following the Bill Hearing.
Weekly-Harford County House Delegation Meeting
Created: 1/21/2022 2:33 PM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
9:00 PM
-
Zoom Meeting
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.