Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Harrison, D. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Charles, D.E. Davis, D.M. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Holmes, Ivey, Jackson, Lehman, J. Lewis, Patterson, Proctor, Turner, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wilkins, Kaiser, Boteler, Buckel, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hornberger, Luedtke, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the number of new P-TECH Planning Grants that may be awarded in fiscal year 2020 to establish a new P-TECH school until after the 2016-2017 cohort of P-TECH students completes the 6-year pathway sequence; and altering certain intent language regarding a prohibition against additional P-TECH schools.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {485769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {485769/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text - Chapter - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
(   7-1803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page