Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/27/2021 3:56:36 PM
Thursday, January 14, 2021
Senate
Created: 12/22/2020 4:41 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Young, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sen Kramer

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sen Guzzone

Sales and Use Tax – Vendor Collection Credit – Job Training
Sen Patterson, et al

Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Sens Bailey and Guzzone

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Sen Elfreth

Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program

Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
11:00 AM to 12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM to 2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the State Board of Elections

Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr EHE (Dept)

Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Chr EHE (Dept)

Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Chr EHE (Dept)

Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Chr EHE (Dept)

Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment - Public Hearing and Notification Modernization Act
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment – Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund – Use of Funds
Chr EHE (Dept)

Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Chr EHE (Dept)

Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal

Created: 12/23/2020 11:27 AM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)

Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Chr FIN (Dept)

Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Chr FIN (Dept)

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension

Created: 1/4/2021 10:49 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Committee Orientation

Created: 12/28/2020 8:59 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr JPR (Dept)

Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
The Pres (Dept)

Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Chr JPR (Dept)

Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney
Chr JPR (Dept)

Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Chr JPR (Dept)

Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
Chr JPR (Dept)

State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public
Chr JPR (Dept)

Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Chr JPR (Dept)

Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
Chr JPR (Dept)

Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
Chr JPR (Dept)

Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Officers - Age Requirement
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer
Chr JPR (Dept)

Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Facilities - Transfer of Ownership and Abolishment of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services
(Removed - 1/4/2021 5:03 PM)

House
Created: 1/4/2021 5:30 PM
Appropriations Committee
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 12/29/2020 12:08 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/29/2020 12:08 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Dels Krimm and Stein

Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Del Charkoudian

Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Del Mautz

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities

Created: 12/22/2020 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
(Added - 12/22/2020 4:02 PM)
Del D. Jones, et al

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Dels Stein and Malone

Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
(Added - 12/22/2020 4:02 PM)
Del Stein

Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
(Added - 12/22/2020 4:02 PM)
Del Carr

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
(Added - 12/22/2020 4:02 PM)
Del Carr

Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
(Added - 12/22/2020 4:02 PM)

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 1/11/2021 4:02 PM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete

Created: 12/23/2020 4:52 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/23/2020 2:52 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
All bills heard on January 14 will be sponsor only, meaning that no oral testimony will be heard aside from the sponsor of the bill.
Del Qi

Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
The bill hearing for HB0130 will be sponsor only.
Del Krebs

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
The bill hearing for HB0224 will be sponsor only.
Del Hill, et al

Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
The bill hearing for HB0290 will be sponsor only.
Del Ebersole

Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
The bill hearing for HB0321 will be sponsor only.
Del Carey

State Government – Department of Information Technology – Cybersecurity
(Removed - 1/7/2021 12:38 PM)

Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
Judiciary Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
House Judiciary Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty

Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Del Shetty

Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Del Grammer

Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Del Atterbeary

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Del Crutchfield, et al

Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense (Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
Del Henson, et al

Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing

Created: 12/22/2020 4:26 PM
Ways and Means Committee
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/22/2020 1:37 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del K. Young

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Del Brooks

Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Del Brooks

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Centenarians
Del Grammer

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Del P. Young

State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Feldmark, et al

Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
Del Palakovich Carr

Maryland Child Tax Credit

Other
Harford
Created: 1/10/2021 3:05 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Agenda Items.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 12/11/2020 1:10 PM
9:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Live Stream Link" under the appropriate date.
Additional information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page