Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Brooks, Conaway, Davis, Fennell, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, Sophocleus, Pena-Melnyk, and Ebersole
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the suspension or expulsion of prekindergarten, kindergarten, first grade, or second grade students from public schools with specified exceptions for an expulsion required by federal law or a suspension for not more than 5 school days under specified circumstances; requiring the principal or school administration to contact a student's parent or guardian under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0651
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {773820/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {743428/4 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-91)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {525766/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Amendment {773820/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-87) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Amendment {743428/4 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-91) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {124732/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
(   4-319, 7-305, 7-305.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page