Day(s)
As of: 5/9/2025 5:19:39 AM
Created: 1/17/2023 3:03 PM
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
These bills are being heard before the Pensions Subcommittee.
Sen Jackson
State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Sen Jackson
State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:27 PM)
Sen Carozza
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Special Death Benefits – Applicability
(Added - 1/26/2023 2:14 PM)
Sen Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - Nonvested Former Members - Return of Accumulated Contributions
(Added - 1/26/2023 2:14 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2023 2:14 PM)
Created: 1/17/2023 3:03 PM
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill Hearings
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/12/2023 10:33 AM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chesapeake Bay Restoration Briefing
Created: 1/13/2023 10:38 AM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Lam
Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2023)
(Added - 1/19/2023 11:23 AM)
Created: 2/2/2023 9:25 AM
3:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Brooks
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Sen Kramer
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
Created: 1/11/2023 12:38 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:40 PM)
(Added - 1/13/2023 12:54 PM)
Sen Klausmeier
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract
(Added - 1/25/2023 10:17 AM)
Sen Augustine
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeships and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children’s Health Program, and Social Services Programs – Eligibility and Enrollment
Sen Elfreth
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Programs – Waiver – Diapers and Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sen Hester
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Fraud (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
(Removed - 1/27/2023 3:19 PM)
Created: 2/1/2023 6:48 PM
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations – Clinical and Graduate Alcohol and Drug Counselors – Licensure
Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/19/2023 12:35 PM)
(Added - 1/19/2023 12:35 PM)
Sen Sydnor
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sens Waldstreicher and Carter
Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement - Pardoned Conviction of Possession of Cannabis (Pardons for Simple Possession of Cannabis Act of 2023)
Sen Waldstreicher
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Created: 1/10/2023 2:12 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/30/2023 12:33 PM
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
National Conference of State Legislatures
Federal Funding for Energy: Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act and Inflation Reduction Act
Maryland Department of the Environment
Overview of The Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative (RGGI) and Greenhouse Gas Reduction Efforts
Created: 2/1/2023 9:44 AM
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Public Service Commission (PSC), Maryland Energy Administration, & Invited Utilities
Status of projects funded through the federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act /Inflation
Reduction Act legislation
Created: 1/19/2023 2:56 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Ways and Means)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
Created: 1/11/2023 1:32 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Introduction to the Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Long-Term Care 101
Created: 1/26/2023 5:37 PM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings to begin at 3pm or following the briefing.
Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- Department of Legislative Services: Fiscal Briefing
Created: 1/20/2023 1:15 PM
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
*HB 170 has been withdrawn by the bill sponsor on 2/1/2023*
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
(Removed - 2/1/2023 2:48 PM)
Created: 1/16/2023 1:43 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Qi
Disclosure of Tax Information – Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board – Authorization
Del Forbes
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program - Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account - Funding
Del Stewart, et al
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2023)
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:00 PM)
Del J. Lewis
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Digital Bay Business Diversity Program - Establishment
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:00 PM)
Del Rogers
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:00 PM)
AIB Special Meeting
Harford County Delegation Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Public Safety
Criminal Procedure
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Police
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation.
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Gaming
Alcoholic Beverages
Courts
Washington County Delegation Meeting
Washington County Delegation Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools