Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:06:24 PM
Payments to Civil Divisions of the State
State Retirement Agency
Maryland Supplemental Retirement Plans
Created: 2/2/2021 3:10 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Klausmeier
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sen Lam (Audio, HrgAidDisp, Sp-LangPath)
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sen Hershey
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Cost Drug or Device Product
The Pres (Admin)
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
Sens Carozza and Kagan
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Sen Feldman
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sen Feldman
Economic Development – Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program – Alterations
(Removed - 2/9/2021 9:16 AM)
Created: 2/15/2021 7:40 AM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Washington
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sen Kelley
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance With State Labor Laws
Created: 2/15/2021 3:59 PM
Monday, February 15, 2021
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Police Reform
Canceled
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/25/2021 8:29 AM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Pres (Admin)
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
(Added - 1/27/2021 10:06 AM)
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
Sen Beidle
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Added - 1/27/2021 10:06 AM)
(Added - 1/27/2021 10:06 AM)
(Added - 1/27/2021 10:06 AM)
(Removed - 1/29/2021 12:35 PM)
Sen Lee, et al
Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
Sen Hough
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
Sens Hershey and Gallion
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
(Removed - 2/10/2021 11:40 AM)
Created: 2/15/2021 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Work Session
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Police Reform
Payments to Civil Divisions of the State
State Retirement Agency
Maryland Supplemental Retirement Plans
Created: 2/8/2021 12:16 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Valderrama
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Chr ECM (Dept)
Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
Del Conaway
Business Regulation – Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions – Conversion of Interest Into Fees
Del Conaway
Business Regulation - Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions - Limitation on Conversion of Interest to Fees
Washington County Delegation
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Del Terrasa
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
(Removed - 2/9/2021 10:23 AM)
Created: 1/29/2021 10:38 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
Del Terrasa
Landlord and Tenant – Commencement of Action to Repossess for Failure to Pay Rent – Required Notice and Grace Period
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
Del Valentino-Smith (Chr Jt Cmte End Hom)
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:07 PM)
Created: 2/16/2021 12:51 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/15/2021 9:24 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/29/2021 10:02 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del McComas
Certificates for Involuntary Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Del Bagnall
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Created: 2/15/2021 9:53 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 123, 303, 429, 551
Created: 2/15/2021 9:53 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 547, 549, 605
Created: 1/15/2021 4:18 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Sponsors for each bill will be given three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while all witnesses will be given two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
(Added - 1/26/2021 6:14 PM)
Del Buckel
Crimes of Violence – Parole (Stopping Dangerous and Violent Criminals Act of 2021)
(Added - 1/26/2021 6:14 PM)
Del Barron
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Metro Transit Police Complaints Board
(Added - 1/26/2021 6:14 PM)
Del Wells
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
(Added - 1/26/2021 6:14 PM)
(Added - 1/26/2021 6:14 PM)
Del J. Lewis
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Health and Government Operations)
(Added - 1/18/2021 6:30 PM)
Del Bartlett (AA Co Admin)
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 2/3/2021 4:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 4:15 PM)
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 2/3/2021 4:15 PM)
Del Washington
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
(Added - 2/3/2021 4:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 4:15 PM)
Created: 2/10/2021 4:37 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation Public Hearing on Statewide Issues