Day(s)
As of: 5/5/2024 11:20:23 PM
Created: 1/15/2021 3:43 PM
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sen Eckardt
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sen Eckardt
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Chr FIN (Dept)
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits
Chr FIN (Dept)
Transportation–Related Property and Copper or Aluminum Items – Duties, Prohibited Acts, and Enforcement
Sen Kramer
Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Created: 1/8/2021 3:49 PM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:11 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sen Kramer
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sens Carozza and West
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sen McCray
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Conviction – Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sen Waldstreicher
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sen Hough
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations
Created: 1/5/2021 3:45 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/4/2021 5:30 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Del Rosenberg
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Environment and Transportation)
Created: 12/29/2020 12:08 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Ebersole
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Created: 12/22/2020 4:21 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Holmes
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Del Krimm
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Created: 1/13/2021 3:02 PM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after bill hearings are complete.
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- Briefing from the Behavioral Health Systems Baltimore on the Greater Baltimore Regional Integrated Crisis System (GBRICS) Partnership
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Hearing Order Below. Bill hearings to begin at 2pm or following the briefing.
Del Sample-Hughes
Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
The bill hearing for HB 119 will be sponsor only.
The bill hearing for HB 393 will be sponsor only.
Del Sample-Hughes
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Dels Johnson and Lisanti
University of Maryland - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact Study
Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Palakovich Carr
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Del Malone
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Criminal Investigator
Del Cardin
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities
Del Hill
Election Judges - Training and Signs - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
The bill hearing for HB0335 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Del Rosenberg
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
The bill hearing for HB0369 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
The bill hearing for HB0206 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
The bill hearing for HB0247 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
The bill hearing for HB0398 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.