Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 3:11:28 AM
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Expansion and Extension
Chr B&T (Dept)
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Chr B&T (Dept)
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment
Sens McCray and Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
Sen Ellis
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Sen McCray
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
Sen Pinsky
State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:02 PM)
Created: 1/6/2021 1:48 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:30 p.m. to 1:30 p.m.
Sen Peters
Higher Education – Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship – Bowie State
Sen Hester
Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
(Added - 1/21/2021 2:37 PM)
Sen Washington
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sens Hester and Zucker
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sens Patterson and Benson
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sens Patterson and Augustine
Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
(Removed - 1/25/2021 11:26 AM)
Created: 1/26/2021 3:21 PM
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The voting session will begin approximately 30 minutes after the conclusion of the bill hearings.
Sens Kagan and West
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Sen Pinsky
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sen Eckardt
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
(Added - 1/15/2021 3:00 PM)
Sen McCray
Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Sen Kelley
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Augustine
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sen Hettleman
Office of the Attorney General - Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Coordinator
Created: 1/25/2021 2:31 PM
Monday, January 25, 2021
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Del Washington
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
Del Korman
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Del Rosenberg
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Created: 1/11/2021 10:47 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Forbes
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Del Lierman
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Del Solomon
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY.
(Added - 1/17/2021 12:33 PM)
Created: 1/18/2021 2:53 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/14/2021 10:18 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Love
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Del Pena-Melnyk
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
(Removed - 1/26/2021 4:38 PM)
Created: 12/22/2020 4:36 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Malone
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Del Charkoudian
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Del Lierman
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Dels Love and Henson
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Del Ivey
Environment – Oil and Natural Gas Produced by Hydraulic Fracturing – Prohibition on Exportation
(Removed - 1/25/2021 9:52 AM)
Created: 1/21/2021 10:32 AM
3:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:50 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Time of the subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete
Created: 1/22/2021 9:58 AM
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Bill Order below
Del Rosenberg
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Kelly
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Created: 1/25/2021 10:33 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 130, HB 297, HB 390
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/15/2021 4:18 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Grammer
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Created: 1/4/2021 3:59 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Education Briefing by MSDE, PSSAM, MABE, and MSEA
Del Wilson
Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Del Queen
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
The bill hearing for HB0400 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
The bill hearing for HB0205 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Del Wilkins
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
(Added - 1/4/2021 1:02 PM)
(Added - 1/4/2021 1:13 PM)
Del Guyton
Maryland Longitudinal Data System – Student Data – Pregnant and Parenting Students
(Removed - 1/25/2021 10:25 AM)
Created: 1/9/2021 7:38 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting
Housing Bills
Education Bills
Bills Held Over
Legislative Bond Initiatives