Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Brooks, Anderton, Boteler, Bridges, Buckel, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Charles, Corderman, Cullison, W. Fisher, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Grammer, Hornberger, Ivey, Jackson, Kelly, Kerr, Krimm, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pippy, Queen, Reilly, Reznik, Saab, Shetty, Shoemaker, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Szeliga, Valderrama, Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of a Class 5 brewery license to brew and bottle malt beverages at a location listed on an individual storage permit; authorizing a local licensing board to conditionally grant an applicant an on-site consumption permit or a Class D beer license that will become effective after the applicant meets certain requirements; authorizing a holder of a micro-brewery license to hold another license; altering the amount of beer that certain manufacturers may sell at retail; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553195/2 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454134/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {553195/2 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {454134/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text - Chapter - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
(   2-207, 2-208, 2-209, 2-210, 2-308, 2-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page