Day(s)
As of: 3/29/2024 5:33:46 AM
Created: 3/15/2021 11:50 AM
3:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
Sens McCray and Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
Chr B&T (Dept)
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
(Added - 3/16/2021 5:10 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 12:48 PM)
Sen Edwards
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 12:14 PM)
Sen Guzzone
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations and Degree and Credential Programs - Alterations
(Added - 3/17/2021 12:48 PM)
(Removed - 3/16/2021 4:49 PM)
Created: 3/10/2021 3:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Feldman
Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Created: 3/17/2021 12:24 PM
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Sydnor
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sen King
Montgomery County - Stormwater Charges - Organizations Offering Agricultural Exhibitions
Sen Hayes
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:46 PM)
Sen Ellis
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Applications for Student Financial Aid
Sens Beidle and Elfreth
State Board of Dental Examiners - Disciplinary Action - Disclosure Requirements and Licensee Profiles
Sen Lam (Chr Joint Audit and Eval Comm)
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sen Jackson
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension
(Added - 3/17/2021 2:52 PM)
(Removed - 3/17/2021 2:52 PM)
Created: 2/11/2021 10:57 AM
Thursday, March 18, 2021
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Smith
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Antiretaliation Provisions
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Benson and Lee
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sen Benson
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Feldman
Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program
(Added - 2/19/2021 4:31 PM)
Sen Feldman
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
(Added - 2/19/2021 4:31 PM)
Del Pena-Melnyk
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Del Holmes
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Del Krimm
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Created: 3/17/2021 10:24 AM
3:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
4:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/16/2021 2:58 PM
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Added - 3/16/2021 6:10 PM)
Del Williams
State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
Created: 3/16/2021 6:57 PM
8:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/16/2021 6:16 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/16/2021 3:36 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/17/2021 10:13 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/16/2021 11:00 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/16/2021 11:45 AM
2:30 PM to 4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/17/2021 9:41 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Del R. Lewis
Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Del Holmes
Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Del Barve
Real Property - Impermissible Restrictions on Use - Portable Basketball Apparatuses
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:44 AM)
Created: 1/28/2021 2:35 PM
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
5:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/12/2021 9:48 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del Smith
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal
(Added - 2/16/2021 9:15 AM)
Del Rosenberg
Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
(Removed - 2/15/2021 5:21 PM)
Created: 3/17/2021 12:46 PM
6:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Or immediately after the second floor session.
Del Luedtke
Procurement - Invasive and Nonnative Plant Species - Prohibition on Use of State Funds
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
Del Carr
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
Del Gilchrist
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 4:24 PM)
Created: 3/15/2021 9:35 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Or 15 minutes after the floor session concludes.
- HB 92, 190, 301, 790, 920
(Added - 3/16/2021 9:44 AM)
- HB 92, 190, 301, 790, 920, 1078
(Removed - 3/16/2021 9:44 AM)
Created: 3/17/2021 4:37 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This vote session will begin at 7pm or 30 minutes after the conclusion of Floor Session*
Created: 3/15/2021 2:38 PM
9:15 AM - Zoom / YouTube
*THIS SUBCOMMITTEE WILL CONTINUE WORKING TODAY AT 12:30 P.M.*
- HB 234
(Added - 3/17/2021 10:11 AM)
- HB 234
(Removed - 3/15/2021 4:09 PM)
- HBs: 234, 240
(Removed - 3/17/2021 10:11 AM)
Created: 3/15/2021 7:43 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Election Law Subcommittee will meet at 2:00 PM or immediately after the Ways & Means Bill Hearing.
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.