Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barve, Boyce, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Jackson, Johnson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valentino-Smith, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to establish a workgroup to carry out the finding and declaration of the General Assembly that it is in the public interest to ensure that the health care protections established by the federal Affordable Care Act continue to protect Maryland residents in light of continued threats to the federal Affordable Care Act; requiring the workgroup to monitor certain court cases and the enforcement of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {716486/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {716486/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
(   15-137.1 )
(   2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page