Day(s)
As of: 5/9/2025 4:47:14 AM
Created: 1/25/2023 10:02 AM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Feldman
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Domestic Partnerships
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)
Income Tax – Out–of–State Taxes Paid by Pass–Through Entities – Addition Modification
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Created: 1/17/2023 1:04 PM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Overview of Blueprint Implementation by Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/11/2023 12:46 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/21/2023 7:15 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2023 7:15 PM)
Sen Augustine
Health Insurance – Annual Behavioral Health Wellness Visits – Coverage and Reimbursement
Sen Hester
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Small Employers – Special Enrollment Period and Marketing
Sen Kramer
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Sen Carter
Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Treatment of Alopecia Areata – Coverage Requirements
(Removed - 1/25/2023 3:54 PM)
Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
1:30 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the conclusion of the fiscal briefing.
(Added - 1/17/2023 2:07 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2023 2:07 PM)
Sen Kagan
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Created: 1/10/2023 1:59 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2023 2:07 PM
3:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Due to technical difficulites Witness Signup for Subcommittee Budget Hearings will be open until 3pm on January 31st.
Created: 1/10/2023 2:09 PM
3:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Due to technical difficulites Witness Signup for Subcommittee Budget Hearings will be open until 3pm on January 31st.
Created: 1/17/2023 3:09 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay
Created: 1/19/2023 2:53 PM
2:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
(Removed - 1/30/2023 1:56 PM)
Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- Access to Counsel in Evictions (ACE) Task Force; January 2023 Report
Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
*As of 1:00pm on 2/1/2023, this hearing will now begin at 3:00pm*
Del Terrasa, et al
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
Del Palakovich Carr, et al
Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
(Added - 1/26/2023 9:35 AM)
Dels Atterbeary and Rosenberg
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2023)
(Added - 1/26/2023 9:35 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:15 PM)
Del Charles, et al
Foreclosure Proceedings - Residential Mortgagors and Grantors - Access to Counsel
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
Del Grammer
Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Maryland Constitutional Carry Act)
(Removed - 1/20/2023 9:04 AM)
Created: 1/18/2023 11:46 AM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Atterbeary
Primary and Secondary Education - Comprehensive Health Education Framework - Established
Del R. Long
Education - Student Behavior - Parent and Guardian Notice and Required Counseling (Parent and Guardian Accountability Act)
Del Wells
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation and Student Members
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony
Del Ebersole, et al
Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition
Created: 1/28/2023 7:23 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation and Howard County Senators work session on local legislation
Created: 1/17/2023 3:07 PM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 1746 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
The County Affairs Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
County Government
Economic Development
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools