Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Busch, Carozza, Carr, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McCray, McIntosh, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Reznik, Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, under specified circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; prohibiting the court from terminating parental rights under specified circumstances; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely specified rights and responsibilities of a parent; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {902110/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Zirkin and Hough)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Zirkin and Hough)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {902110/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {138476/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Zirkin and Hough) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Zirkin and Hough) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1401 through 5-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page