Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Carey, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Oaks, Patterson, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, C. Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to monitor and assess the impact of potential and actual federal changes to specified health care programs and to provide recommendations for State and local action to protect the access of residents of the State to affordable health coverage; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to annually report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {676788/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-88)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {276784/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-48)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {676788/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-88) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {276784/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-48) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Referred Rules 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page