Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Atterbeary, Acevero, Anderson, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Boyce, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Jackson, Johnson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, R. Watson, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a firearm manufactured using a computer-aided fabrication device unless the firearm is imprinted with a serial number issued by a federally licensed firearms manufacturer or importer; establishing penalties of up to 5 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $5,000, or both for violations of the Act; requiring, by September 30, 2019, the Department of State Police to develop a plan for a State system for the registration of certain firearms; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0882
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms and Ghost Guns)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {582918/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-601 through 4-603, 7-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page