About Publications

Publications available on this website are organized into the following categories:

"Legislative and Legal" includes publications that summarize the activity that occurred during each legislative session.

"Budget and Fiscal" includes publications that analyze and summarize the state's budget and other fiscal matters.

"Committee" includes publications that have been presented to committees or reports prepared by committees.

"Commission, Task Force, and Work Group" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by these groups.

"Other" includes all other publications.


Additional publications created by the Department of Legislative Services, mandated by legislation, or requested in the Joint Chair's Budget Report may be found in the Legislative Library & Information Services Catalog.



Publications Look Up




Publication Name ▴Published
2018 - Fiscal Briefing - January 22, 2018This overview of the budget and other significant fiscal issues is presented to the legislative committees by the Office of Policy Analysis shortly after the Governor's introduction of the budget.1/22/2018
2018 - Joint Committee on Pensions - 2017 Interim ReportReport of the Committee's 2017 interim activities and legislative recommendations.1/26/2018
2018 - Legislative Policy Committee - Summary Reports of Committees to the Legislative Policy Committee (2017 Interim Report)The Committee's function is to coordinate and supervise generally the work of the General Assembly when it is not in session1/1/2018
2018 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 1Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/1/2018
2018 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 2Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/8/2018
2018 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 3Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/14/2018