Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Cain, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Ivey, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Washington, R. Watson, P. Young, Pendergrass, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program to improve data collection on uninsured individuals and to maximize enrollment of eligible uninsured individuals in affordable insurance programs; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to establish a Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Advisory Workgroup; requiring the Comptroller to include a certain checkoff, to indicate whether an individual is interested in obtaining minimum essential health coverage, on certain State income tax forms; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0802
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {716387/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-12)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Option (Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2019)
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {716387/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Option (Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2019)
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (119-12) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {877971/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-15) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text - Chapter - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
(   31-101, 31-201 through 31-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page