About Publications

Publications available on this website are organized into the following categories:

"Legislative and Legal" includes publications that summarize the activity that occurred during each legislative session.

"Budget and Fiscal" includes publications that analyze and summarize the state's budget and other fiscal matters.

"Committee" includes publications that have been presented to committees or reports prepared by committees.

"Commission, Task Force, and Work Group" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by these groups.

"Other" includes all other publications.


Additional publications created by the Department of Legislative Services, mandated by legislation, or requested in the Joint Chair's Budget Report may be found in the Legislative Library & Information Services Catalog.



Publications Look Up




Publication Name ▴Published
2017 - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 (HB152/SB172) - Budget Summary, Provisions, and RecommendationsBudget Reconciliation and Financing Act - Budget Summary, Provisions, and Recommendations2/28/2017
2017 - Fiscal Briefing - January 23, 2017This overview of the budget and other significant fiscal issues is presented to the legislative committees by the Office of Policy Analysis shortly after the Governor's introduction of the budget.1/23/2017
2017 - House Appropriations Committee - Report on HB150 - the Budget Bill and House Bill 152 - the Budget Reconciliation and Financing ActA summary report which provides information on the status of the general fund, spending affordability, and other important issues.3/13/2017
2017 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of HB150 - (Budget Bill FY2018)House committee reprint of the budget bill which contains the committee amendments.3/13/2017
2017 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of HB152 - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017House committee reprint of the Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act which contains the committee amendments.3/13/2017
2017 - Joint Committee on Pensions - 2016 Interim ReportReport of the Committee's 2016 interim activities and legislative recommendations.1/9/2017
2017 - Report of the House Appropriations Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB150 (Budget Bill FY2018)Report from the House Appropriations Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the governor's budget bill.3/13/2017
2017 - Report of the Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - IN RE: State Delegate Dan K. MorhaimReport of the Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - IN RE: State Delegate Dan K. Morhaim3/3/2017
2017 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB150 (Budget Bill FY2018)Report from the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the governor's budget bill.3/20/2017
2017 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB151 (Capital Budget Bill)Report from the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the capital budget bill.3/23/2017
2017 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Summary Report on HB150 - the Budget Bill and House Bill 152 - the Budget Reconciliation and Financing ActA summary report which provides information on the status of the general fund, spending affordability, and other important issues.3/20/2017
2017 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of HB150 - (Budget Bill FY2018)Senate committee reprint of the budget bill which contains the committee amendments.3/20/2017
2017 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of HB151 (Capital Budget)Senate committee reprint of the capital budget bill which contains the committee amendments.3/23/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 1Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/1/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 2Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/8/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 3Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/15/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 4Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.2/22/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 5Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.3/1/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 6Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.3/8/2017
2017 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 7Report of the Executive Nominations Committee of the Senate which examines all nominations for appointments made by the Governor that require Senate confirmation. The committee reports its recommendations to the Senate which subsequently votes to confirm or reject the nominees.3/15/2017