About Publications

Publications available on this website are organized into the following categories:

"Legislative and Legal" includes publications that summarize the activity that occurred during each legislative session.

"Budget and Fiscal" includes publications that analyze and summarize the state's budget and other fiscal matters.

"Committee" includes publications that have been presented to committees or reports prepared by committees.

"Commission, Task Force, and Work Group" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by these groups.

"Other" includes all other publications.


Additional publications created by the Department of Legislative Services, mandated by legislation, or requested in the Joint Chair's Budget Report may be found in the Legislative Library & Information Services Catalog.



Publications Look Up




Publication Name ▴Published
2016 - 90 Day Report, A Review of the 2016 Legislative SessionSeveral days after the end of the regular session each year, the Department of Legislative Services publishes The 90 Day Report - a comprehensive review of legislation that was considered during the session.4/15/2016
2016 - Abnormal Effective Date InformationThis list contains the sections of the Annotated Code of Maryland that, after January 1, 2016, are subject to limited duration, delayed effective dates, or contingencies not yet met.1/1/2016
2016 - Compilation of the Changes in the Public Local LawsThis annual compilation is not an official updating of the Code of Public Local Laws, but is prepared by the Department of Legislative Services as a guide to the current status of the public local laws in Maryland's counties and Baltimore City.1/20/2016
2016 - Effective Dates - JanuaryThis list gives effective dates of legislation with June 1, July 1, and October 1 being the most common effective dates.1/4/2016
2016 - Ethics GuideThe Legislative Ethics Guide is based on the Maryland Public Ethics Law, Title 15 of the State Government Article. Topics discussed in the guide include conflicts of interest, gifts, prohibited employment and compensation, and financial disclosure. Ethics opinions and forms are also included.1/13/2016
2016 - Guide to Drunk and Drugged Driving LawsDescribes the criminal and administrative offenses concerning drunk and drugged driving and the associated penalties.1/29/2016
2016 - Hearing Schedules and AddendumsThe weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.3/16/2016
2016 - Roster and List of Committees (Session)The roster contains biographies of legislators, committee membership lists, Senate and House membership lists, and various appendices providing other pertinent legislative information.4/28/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 03/14/2016A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.3/14/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 04/04/2016A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/4/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 04/07/2016A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/7/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 04/12/2016A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/12/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 04/26/2016A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/26/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Vetoed on 04/01/2016A list of the bills vetoed for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/4/2016
2016 Regular Session - Bills Vetoed on 04/05/2016A list of the bills vetoed for each session is compiled by legislative staff.4/6/2016
2016 Regular Session - Current Status Report (House)Current Status of All House Legislation Introduced5/3/2016
2016 Regular Session - Current Status Report (Senate)Current Status of All Senate Legislation Introduced5/3/2016
2016 Regular Session - Gubernatorial Appointments - Terms of Office for Statewide and Local Boards and Commissions that Expire in 2016The Department of Legislative Services compiles a list of these offices whose terms expire during the current calendar year. The offices listed include only those that require confirmation by the Senate of Maryland.1/1/2016
2016 Regular Session - Issue PapersPrior to each session, staff of the Department of Legislative Services, Office of Policy Analysis, prepare an information report on issues. This document is a compilation of the issue papers arranged by major topic.1/1/2016
2016 Regular Session - Laws of the State of Maryland - Volume IAfter the Governor signs or vetoes bills, the Department of Legislative Services publishes the Laws of Maryland (Session Laws) for that year. The Session Laws are a set of volumes containing all laws adopted during the previous session and all bills vetoed by the Governor with the veto messages.4/25/2016
2016 Regular Session - Laws of the State of Maryland - Volume IIAfter the Governor signs or vetoes bills, the Department of Legislative Services publishes the Laws of Maryland (Session Laws) for that year. The Session Laws are a set of volumes containing all laws adopted during the previous session and all bills vetoed by the Governor with the veto messages.4/25/2016
2016 Regular Session - Laws of the State of Maryland - Volume IIIAfter the Governor signs or vetoes bills, the Department of Legislative Services publishes the Laws of Maryland (Session Laws) for that year. The Session Laws are a set of volumes containing all laws adopted during the previous session and all bills vetoed by the Governor with the veto messages.4/25/2016
2016 Regular Session - Laws of the State of Maryland - Volume IVAfter the Governor signs or vetoes bills, the Department of Legislative Services publishes the Laws of Maryland (Session Laws) for that year. The Session Laws are a set of volumes containing all laws adopted during the previous session and all bills vetoed by the Governor with the veto messages.4/25/2016
2016 Regular Session - Popular Terms ListBills receiving numerous calls from the public listed by category and using popular terms.4/26/2016
2016 Regular Session - Veto Override on 01/21/2016A list of the veto overrides for each session is compiled by legislative staff.1/25/2016
2016 Regular Session - Veto Override on 02/09/2016A list of the veto overrides for each session is compiled by legislative staff.2/12/2016